Trustees CHURCHILL LINES FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1158677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Charles Lewis Chair 01 July 2014
THE COMPASS FOR LIFE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Langley Christian Sharp MBE Trustee 30 July 2019
None on record
Micheal Rhodes Pullen Trustee 19 April 2015
None on record
LT COL AJE TRUETT MBE Trustee 15 September 2014
None on record
PETER MARK PATRICK O'KANE Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
DAVID JOHN CHARTERS Trustee 01 July 2014
None on record
Edward Dixon Sandry Trustee 17 June 2014
None on record