THE TALKING TABOOS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and publishing results of research to benefit those whose lives are impacted by social taboos.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Margaret Grace McLaren | Chair | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shivani Gangrade | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Mallion | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Marcus | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £20.00k | £34.42k | £17.15k | £22.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £121 | £10.43k | £26.50k | £36.06k | £13.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 MAR 2018 as amended on 07 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION INTO PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AND HEALTHCARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE CHARITABLE, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND DIALOGUE AND (SAVE FOR PURPOSES INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY TO THOSE OBJECTS), NO OTHER PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5, Callow Park,
Callow Hill
Brinkworth
England
SN15 5FD
- Phone:
- 07784312020
- Email:
- hello@talkingtaboos.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window