Accounts and annual returns THE DEBATING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163249
Charity reporting is overdue by 1787 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
Annual return 18 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 692 days
Annual return 18 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1057 days
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1057 days
Annual return 18 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1422 days
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1422 days
Annual return 18 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1787 days
Accounts and TAR 18 August 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1787 days