Financial history SEAFORD MUSEUM & HERITAGE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1158790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £17.98k £34.14k £32.93k £33.07k £50.69k
Total expenditure £24.39k £23.27k £26.95k £31.64k £37.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.00k £14.07k N/A N/A N/A