DT38 FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to rise awareness and change the stigma associated with mens health issues with a focus on testicular cancer. We aim to do this through providing educational programmes and opportunities for the youth of our community to help shape a generation of children who are self- aware about their health and wellbeing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Australia
Governance
- 02 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACY LEE TOMBIDES | Chair | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Jim Tombides | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Toni Sealey | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michele Verroken | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Sweet | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOE HARRY JOHN SEALEY | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TAYLOR JAMES TOMBIDES | Trustee | 09 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.34k | £28.14k | £79.72k | £47.93k | £76.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.24k | £33.73k | £49.73k | £59.27k | £74.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2024
(These accounts |
30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 AUG 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/08/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS; 3.2 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: 3.3 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.4 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, HEALTHY RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3.5 TO FURTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF, AND PROVISION FOR, HEALTH INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) BY: 3.5.1 THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION TO PEOPLE AFFECTED, WHETHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, BY ALL FORMS OF CANCER AND, IN PARTICULAR, TESTICULAR CANCER; 3.5.2 THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH IN TO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ALL FORMS OF CANCER AND, IN PARTICULAR, TESTICULAR CANCER, AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND 3.6 TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY DEBILITATING, LIFE THREATENING OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES (INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, ALL FORMS OF CANCER) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND SUCH OTHER SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUCKLE LLP
TIME CENTRAL
32 GALLOWGATE
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE1 4BF
- Phone:
- 07880203113
- Email:
- DT38@DT38.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window