THE ALEX GROUP

Charity Number: 1159263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide residential care for people age 18-65 with disabilities who require 24 hour support. This is suitable for people who no longer can live on their own or in supported living, or for people who have been supported by their carer and it has become too difficult for them to continue caring for them. we also offer day care and respite care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackburn With Darwen
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 November 2014: CIO registration
  • 01 March 2017: Funds received from 507588 THE ALEX GROUP
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ROUGH LEE HOME (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES ANTHONY LIVESEY Chair 18 February 2013
None on record
Sean Gaughan Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Erica Newell Trustee 20 February 2025
None on record
Christopher Chaplow Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Angela Marie Tuohey Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
JOHN CAIN Trustee 29 July 2020
BRAITHWAITE INSTITUTE
Received: On time
SIMON WALSH Trustee 09 June 2020
HEALTH CARE SUPPLY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DAVID CAIN Trustee 11 September 2013
BRGS FUNDRAISING TRUST
Received: On time
PAIN RELIEF FOUNDATION
Received: On time
SANDRA EDWARDS Trustee 18 February 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £556.24k £816.51k £721.01k £750.95k £856.48k
Total expenditure £563.00k £630.36k £691.81k £736.76k £891.41k
Income from government contracts £518.06k £752.13k N/A £696.07k £808.74k
Income from government grants N/A £39.28k £35.64k £8.32k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £21.33k £50.10k £43.90k £22.77k £3.15k
Income - Other trading activities £8.31k £6.18k £6.13k £6.34k £7.37k
Income - Charitable activities £518.06k £752.13k £666.77k £708.45k £820.74k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.54k £8.10k £368 £5.09k £9.90k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.85k £8.30k £15.32k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £563.00k £630.36k £691.63k £736.56k £891.12k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £24.66k £32.42k £25.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £175 £192 £297

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £434.42k £414.18k £395.87k £524.15k £564.65k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £137.26k £361.85k £397.60k £289.60k £205.36k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £46.43k £64.63k £52.86k £58.95k £50.15k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Rough Lee Home
Rough Lee Road
Accrington
BB5 2LN
Phone:
01254 393152