THE IDEAS PARTNERSHIP UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By making grants and raising awareness: community capacity building to help the disadvantaged Roma, Ashkali and Egyptian community in South Eastern Europe (SEE) to meet their own needs and participate more fully; relief of poverty in disadvantaged communities in SEE; promotion of protection of the environment; advance education in SEE, generally and in the traditional folk cultures of the region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Albania
- Kosovo
Governance
- 22 April 2015: CIO registration
- TIPUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Norgenta Lata | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Robert Hill | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GOWING | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
AURELIE VIARD-CRETAT | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SYBILLE RAPHAEL | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILTON | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA JANE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.96k | £58.73k | £65.20k | £38.44k | £51.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.19k | £107.83k | £65.10k | £51.80k | £54.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND RAISING AWARENESS USING SOCIAL MEDIA: (1) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF THE ROMA, ASHKALI AND EGYPTIAN COMMUNITY IN KOSOVO AND SOUTH EASTERN EUROPE, IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIAL AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SOUTH EASTERN EUROPE; (3) THE PROMOTION OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT IN SOUTH EASTERN EUROPE; (4) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SOUTH EASTERN EUROPE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (5) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN SOUTH EASTERN EUROPE IN THE TRADITIONAL FOLK CULTURES OF THE REGION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 THE TERRACE
PORT ISAAC
PL29 3SG
- Phone:
- 01208880998
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window