Financial history EDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1160939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £4.21k £34.10k £121.34k £110.70k £79.87k
Total expenditure £6.15k £26.76k £140.45k £65.57k £63.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A