Financial history MARLOW BOTTOM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1159260
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.01k £21.00k £32.08k £35.99k £35.37k
Total expenditure £29.44k £21.30k £24.32k £30.70k £32.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.79k N/A N/A N/A