THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE, COLCHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
? Regular public worship open to all. ? Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved. ? Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups ? Taking of religious assemblies in schools. ? Promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings ? Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 13 November 2014: Previously excepted registration
- ST LUKE'S PCC, COLCHESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hannah Rosemary Cooper | Chair | 23 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Tracey Linda Cowell | Trustee | 12 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Charlotte Rachel Day | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mojisola Omolade Olose | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Duthie | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sarah Hayward | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Deborah Mayne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ordelia Sansford | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robert Duthie | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
JULIA THOMAS | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sarah Margaret Adcock | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adrian David Kevin Jones | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colin John Smith | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Mark Angier | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Paul William Mann | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Benjamin Harris | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Gettings | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Diana Salome BENGE-ABBOTT | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
HUGH LESLIE THOMAS | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £146.61k | £138.56k | £147.79k | £145.45k | £140.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.01k | £146.03k | £133.88k | £142.48k | £142.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £2.75k | £750 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 01 OCT 2012
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 PAMPAS CLOSE
COLCHESTER
CO4 9ST
- Phone:
- 01206854984
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window