MARTIN GEDDES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide grants to organisations, including other charities, whose work is in line with our objects
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDI ELIZABETH GEISLER | Chair | 29 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne O'Connor | Trustee | 14 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY JOHN GREEN | Trustee | 29 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVID COLLINS | Trustee | 29 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr SALLY BELINDA GEDDES | Trustee | 29 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALEXANDER LAURENCE GEDDES | Trustee | 19 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 27/08/2020 | 27/08/2021 | 27/08/2022 | 27/08/2023 | 27/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.87k | £27.35k | £24.22k | £110.20k | £225.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.30k | £88.24k | £133.13k | £148.95k | £223.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 27 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 27 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 August 2020 | 20 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29/12/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('OBJECTS') ARE: THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH OF PERSONS WHO SUFFER FROM DRUG AND ALCOHOL PROBLEMS, THOSE WHO ARE IN DANGER OF BECOMING ADDICTED TO OR DEPENDENT UPON DRUGS OF ANY DESCRIPTION, ALCOHOL, SOLVENTS OR OTHER ADDICTIVE SUBSTANCES AND THOSE AFFECTED BY DRUG AND ALCOHOL PROBLEMS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS WHICH APPLY A TWELVE STEP PHILOSOPHY AND TREATMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parkfield
Woodend
Styal
Wilmslow
SK9 4HF
- Phone:
- 01625540850
- Website:
-
martingeddescharitabletrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window