Financial history GENERATION BUILDERS

Charity number: 1159923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.95k £16.64k £9.81k £19.67k £66.49k
Total expenditure £27.34k £14.08k £16.15k £21.68k £34.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A