Accounts and annual returns THE WINNIE MABASO FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 24 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window