Trustees THE WINNIE MABASO FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1160321

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Caroline Newton-Bingham | Chair | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Millicent Jones | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phemelo Mitchell | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mluleki Shongwe | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mpho Maponya | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Williams | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Clair Diggle | Trustee | 07 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Millar | Trustee | 04 February 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.