TEKKATHO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE PEOPLE OF MYANMAR (BURMA), INCLUDING BY: (A) PROVIDING DIGITAL LIBRARIES AND OTHER EDUCATION INFRASTRUCTURE IN AREAS OF LIMITED OR NO INTERNET CONNECTIVITY; (B) PROMOTING EXCHANGES, TEACHING PLACEMENTS AND RESEARCH PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND INTERNATIONAL PARTNERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Burma
Governance
- 25 February 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel David Collison | Trustee | 27 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
MAY THA-HLA | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Edward Nash | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ma Khin Mar Mar Kyi | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celia Anne Russell | Trustee | 02 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.68k | £32.85k | £11.67k | £15.41k | £13.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.78k | £28.39k | £18.08k | £25.95k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 SEP 2014
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF THE PEOPLE OF MYANMAR (BURMA), INCLUDING BY: (A) PROVIDING DIGITAL LIBRARIES AND OTHER EDUCATION INFRASTRUCTURE IN AREAS OF LIMITED OR NO INTERNET CONNECTIVITY; (B) PROMOTING EXCHANGES, TEACHING PLACEMENTS AND RESEARCH PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND INTERNATIONAL PARTNERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLYOAKE HOUSE
HANOVER STREET
MANCHESTER
M60 0AS
- Phone:
- 03303211789
- Email:
- contact@tekkatho.foundation
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window