WES LUNN DESIGN EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to promote education in the field of the creative disciplines. This activity includes assisting worthy aspiring practitioners to achieve their potential and thus create a pool of talent in this field for the benefit of the whole, and other such activity that might achieve this. ( The Charity sometimes abreviates its name to "Design Education Trust" for PR ease.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Catherine Rouse | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosemarie Anne Fordham | Trustee | 21 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rouse | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALEC ROBERTSON FRSA | Trustee | 02 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.60k | £19.14k | £22.02k | £22.35k | £22.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.31k | £31.25k | £31.14k | £21.34k | £42.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 March 2021 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF THE CREATIVE DISCIPLINES BY ASSISTING WORTHY ASPIRING PRACTITIONERS TO ACHIEVE THEIR POTENTIAL AND THUS CREATE A POOL OF TALENT IN THIS FIELD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE WHOLE TO PROVIDE GRANTS TO STUDENTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE EDUCATIONAL COURSES IN THE FIELD OF THE CREATIVE DISCIPLINES. TO DO ALL SUCH OTHER THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL TO THE ABOVE TO ACHIEVE THE SAME OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Ardmore Way
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU2 9RR
- Phone:
- 01483 567060
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window