Accounts and annual returns SUSSEX KURDISH COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1161420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 February 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 February 2025 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 February 2025 743 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2021 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required