THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ON EAGLES' WINGS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organising Weekly Church Services and Community Outreach Events. Organising Christian conferences and seminars in Basildon Area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 16 September 2014: Standard registration
- RCCG ON EAGLES' WINGS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLUBUNMI ONANUGA | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
DANDY OBARO ODEKA | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ADEBOLA ALADESULU | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.69k | £71.82k | £56.74k | £46.21k | £62.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.46k | £47.70k | £54.80k | £60.80k | £65.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") WHICH ARE TO BE CARRIED OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: 6.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE; AND 6.1.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Stour Road
Chadwell St. Mary
Grays
RM16 4BS
- Phone:
- 07956493880
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window