TRAFFORD COMMUNITY MUSIC TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support musical tuition and activities, predominantly for residents of Trafford (primarily young people) and those studying at schools in Trafford
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Trafford
Governance
- 11 December 2014: CIO registration
- TRAFFORD POPS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICHOLAS DAVIS SOLICITOR | Trustee | 11 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARETH LOGGENBERG BSC ACMA | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER WOOLFSON | Trustee | 14 November 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2022 | 269 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2022 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2022 | 634 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 March 2022 | 634 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 21 LIVING IN TRAFFORD FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) MAKING GRANTS OR AWARDS TOWARDS THE COST OF MUSIC LESSONS AND ENSEMBLES; (B) MAKING LOANS OF INSTRUMENTS OR MAKING REPAIRS TO INSTRUMENTS; (C) ORGANISING OR ASSISTING WITH OR ASSISTING WITH THE FUNDING OF ORCHESTRAL TRIPS AND TOURS AND RAISING AWARENESS OF MUSICAL OPPORTUNITIES BY COMMISSIONING AND/OR ORGANISING AND/OR SUPPORTING CONCERTS OR OTHER MUSICAL PERFORMANCES. (D) MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS TO ORGANISATIONS OR TEACHERS WITHIN TRAFFORD PROVIDING MUSICAL TUITION OR ENSEMBLE OPPORTUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MINIM LAW
22-24 Greenwood Street
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 1RZ
- Phone:
- 01619808668
- Email:
- tyopops@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window