BETHNAL GREEN SPEAR TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bethnal Green Spear Trust runs pre-employment training courses for young people living in East London. The Spear Programme is a highly interactive, award-winning twelve-month programme that equips and supports disadvantaged 16 to 24 year olds to place them into long-term employment. 75% of Spear completers enter employment, education or training, and remain there a year later.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hackney
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 19 December 2014: CIO registration
- BGST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ohara Joy Smith | Chair | 05 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
JUNIOR BAYODE | Trustee | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rablen | Trustee | 03 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.80k | £106.57k | £96.97k | £89.67k | £93.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.06k | £107.20k | £98.89k | £85.36k | £98.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.84k | £24.15k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 323 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 235 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 February 2024 | 235 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND WITHIN A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 16 TO 24 LIVING IN EAST LONDON BY PROVIDING ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT AND ORGANISING EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE ADVANCE IN LIFE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO AND PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT, ENABLING YOUNG PEOPLE TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT; (D) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VICARAGE
ST. PETER'S CLOSE
LONDON
E2 7AE
- Phone:
- 020 3475 0432
- Email:
- hello@spearbethnalgreen.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window