FRENCH BULLDOG RESCUE GB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Breed specifc rescue of French Bulldogs, we are a non profit organisation run by two volunteers Karen and Rachel,we have never bred or shown dogs our interest is wholly with the rescue aspect of the breed .All the dogs are neutered, chipped , vaccinated and come with 5 weeks free insurance our goal is to place healthy and happy French Bulldogs into well-matched, carefully screened forever homes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 October 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAREN CROSSAN | Chair | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Clough | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Courteney Garsden | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE STOCK | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Penny Griffin | Trustee | 17 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE BARKER | Trustee | 14 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
FIONA CUE | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
SONIA RAMAGE | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KIM WATTS | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.81k | £14.71k | £6.60k | £5.78k | £4.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.40k | £9.60k | £4.57k | £11.41k | £3.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DOGS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TYPES OF BULLDOG BREEDS, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH DOGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 COLUMBIA WAY
GROVE
Wantage
Oxfordshire
OX12 0QJ
- Phone:
- 07769907730
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window