VOLITION COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We operate as a Cathedral Volunteer Programme for unemployed people. We bring a sharp focus to their employability and skills needs and create a structured pathway to support them back to work. Our volunteers are not clients or customers, it is their decision to choose and commit to being a volunteer and they can stay as long as they want to. There are no goodbyes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 02 February 2015: CIO registration
- VOLITION (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Very Revd Rogers Govender | Chair | 02 February 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
JOHN EDWARD ATHERDEN FCA | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
ANTHONY O'CONNOR | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
JAMES BLAKEY | Trustee | 02 February 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.39k | £142.52k | £128.88k | £330.32k | £149.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.13k | £138.78k | £148.49k | £232.61k | £211.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.00k | £7.00k | £22.93k | £135.10k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2023 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 March 2023 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 150 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2021 | 150 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT. 3.2 THE CIO SHALL PURSUE THESE OBJECTIVES THROUGH STRUCTURED VOLUNTEERING PLACEMENTS AND SUPPORT TO PREPARE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE FOR WORK AND CONNECT THEM WITH LOCAL EMPLOYERS. THIS WILL BE DELIVERED IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 3.2.1 RAISING ASPIRATIONS AND CONFIDENCE - BY CHALLENGING COMFORT ZONES, PARTICIPATING AND SEEING NEW POSSIBILITIES, PEER SUPPORT, LIFE COACHING. 3.2.2 REMOVING BARRIERS TO WORK - PRACTISING WORK READY SKILLS FROM CONFIDENCE, SKILLS, OVERCOMING PERSONAL ISSUES TO TRANSPORT AND BETTER NETWORKS. 3.2.3 EMPLOYER ENGAGEMENT - CAREERS TALKS, SITE VISITS, TRAINING, GUARANTEED INTERVIEWS, MOCK INTERVIEWS, CREATING A LASTING SHIFT IN EMPLOYERS' ATTITUDES TO UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, THEIR HIRING PRACTISES AND READINESS TO SUPPORT PEOPLE. 3.2.4 INCREASING SKILLS - SOME WITH LEVEL 1 QUALIFICATION, OTHERS COMPLETING NVQS, WORK EXPERIENCE, VOCATIONAL COURSES, FURTHER VOLUNTEERING, WORK EXPERIENCE. 3.2.5 IMPROVED HEALTH AND WELLBEING. 3.2.6 SOCIAL INCLUSION - FROM DISENGAGED TO INVOLVED AND PARTICIPATING. 3.3 NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES 'ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANCHESTER CATHEDRAL
VICTORIA STREET
MANCHESTER
M3 1SX
- Phone:
- 01618332220
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
volitioncommunity.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window