THE WELSH VETERANS PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AIM IS TO PROVIDE A HOLISTIC SERVICE FOR VETERANS IN WALES, WHERE THERE IS NEED: ACCOMMODATION, ASSITANCE AND WELLBEING. SO FAR OUR MAIN EFFORT HAS BEEN THE SECURING AND SUSTAINMENT OF ASSURED TENANCY CLUSTERS IN SOUTH WALES, IN PARTNERSHIP HELPING OUT OVER 400 PEOPLE. AIM TO EXPAND ACROSS WALES, OUR PARTNERS & RESOURCES ALLOWING. WE ALSO HAVE AN ALLOTMENT HUB FOR VETERANS IN CARDIFF.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Total income includes £19,250 from 3 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 13 January 2015: CIO registration
- 26 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- 26 March 2025: Funds transferred to 1152766 WELSH GUARDS CHARITY
- WALK ON WALES (WOW) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.83k | £389 | £8.03k | £56.02k | £29.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £1.29k | £4.18k | £46.15k | £28.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £50.75k | £19.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 May 2023 | 87 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 March 2022 | 51 days late | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 409 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 416 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF BOTH CURRENT AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM ARMED FORCES WHO ARE SUFFERING ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ANY SUCH OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM FIT.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM ARMED FORCES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window