HAMPSHIRE FOSTERING NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support Hampshire's fostering families and their Looked After Children (LAC). Our current activities this year include: A Closed Facebook support group, social events and activities for the children, a regular newsletter, regular virtual contact and information meetings, and more. These activities help build resilience, placement stability & carer retention.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 March 2015: Standard registration
- H.F.N (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB CADDY | Chair | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Wootton-Beard | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mitchell | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Warwick Bond | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Catherine Williamson | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Bourke | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.32k | £750 | £11.05k | £4.29k | £5.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £809 | £12.53k | £2.64k | £6.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2015 as amended on 14 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF “CHILDREN LOOKED AFTER” AND TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF FOSTER CARERS AND THE CHILDREN IN THEIR CARE WITHIN HAMPSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A. PROMOTING THE PROVISION OF HIGH QUALITY FOSTER CARE FOR CHILDREN LOOKED AFTER IN PARTNERSHIP WITH CHILDREN'S SERVICES DEPARTMENT (“THE DEPARTMENT”), AND TO WORK WITH THE DEPARTMENT IN THE PRACTICE AND PROMOTION OF ANTI-DISCRIMINATION, ANTI-RACISM AND EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES. B. SUPPORTING THE DEPARTMENT IN THEIR RECRUITMENT OF SUITABLE PERSONS TO BECOME FOSTER CARERS: AND C. SUPPORTING FOSTER CARERS THEMSELVES AND PROMOTING AND PROTECTING THEIR INTERESTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Bishops Way
ANDOVER
Hampshire
SP10 3EH
- Phone:
- 01264355418
- Email:
- treasurer@hfnyourvoice.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window