THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE WITH ST BARTHOLOMEW, READING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens and parents and toddlers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Reading
Governance
- 26 September 2014: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST LUKE WITH BARTHOLOMEW, READING (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Dianne Nadine Erla Irish Tavares | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
EVERETTE MARSHALL | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Vine | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Webster | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Tonkyn | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Sidney Allister Cox | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Webb | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Ann Davis | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Shield | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ola Cassels White | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Lyne | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Alan Carnell | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev CHRISTINE FIONA BLACKMAN | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr SALLY-ANN MCDOWELL | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
LESLIE GREEN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|||||
HILARY JUNE JAKEMAN | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £124.84k | £99.82k | £99.58k | £116.05k | £125.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.52k | £115.19k | £253.38k | £171.44k | £114.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Lukes Church
Erleigh Road
READING
RG1 5LH
- Phone:
- 01189666389
- Email:
- office@redlandsparish.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window