THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S, TENTERDEN KENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St.Mildred's was created in April 2014 to assist in the vital task of maintaining the fabric of Tenterden's ancient Grade 1 listed church. The activities have included appealing for donations and providing fund raising performances and events in the church and the local area. Funding for repairs to the church building has been provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 18 November 2014: Standard registration
- FOSM (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Northen | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Michael Stephens | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JILLIAN MARY CLARK | Trustee | 23 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Jeremy Denison Cooper | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Harry Kneller | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CHARLES MONCKTON | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.24k | £14.91k | £31.15k | £22.02k | £46.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.20k | £37.34k | £5.96k | £6.09k | £32.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £600 | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 OCT 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE A)TO ADVANCE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE GRADE 1 LISTED BUILDING THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MILDRED, TENTERDEN IN THE DIOCESE OF CANTERBURY (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CHURCH") AND OF THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH. B)IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE CHARITY MAY: (I)MAKE GRANTS OR GIFTS OF OTHER PROPERTY TO THE CLERGY, CHURCHWARDENS AND PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST MILDRED TENTERDEN EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE PURPOSE OF THE SAID OBJECTS, AND GENERALLY ASSIST THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THE CARE AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH. (II)ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND CONCERTS AND RECITALS AND EVENTS. (III)COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THE OBJECTS. CAUSE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINTED OR OTHERWISE CIRCULATED, GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE, SUCH PAPERS, BOOKS, PERIODICALS, PAMPHLETS OR OTHER DOCUMENTATION OR FILMS, WEBSITES OR RECORDED TAPES (WHETHER AUDIO OR VISUAL OR BOTH) AS SHALL FURTHER THE OBJECTS. (IV)RAISE FUNDS BY ANY LAWFUL MEANS AND THROUGH ANY LAWFUL ACTIVITY AND INVITE AND RECEIVE CONTRIBUTIONS FROM ANY PERSON OR PERSONS WHATSOEVER BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTIONS. (V)INVEST THE MONIES OF THE CHARITY NOT IMMEDIATELY REQUIRED FOR THE SAID OBJECTS IN OR UPON SUCH INVESTMENTS, SECURITIES OR PROPERTY AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, SUBJECT NEVERTHELESS OF SUCH CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AS MAY FOR THE TIME BEING BE IMPOSED OR REQUIRED BY LAW. (VI)DO ALL SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SAID OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 Eastwell Meadows
TENTERDEN
TN30 6QR
- Phone:
- 07760161536
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window