Financial history CHEETHAM HILL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505257
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £103.27k £37.97k £36.12k £31.99k £15.83k
Total expenditure £43.91k £40.22k £42.59k £42.32k £55.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A