Accounts and annual returns KH THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1161483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 January 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 January 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window