KH THEATRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1161483
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote, maintain, improve and advance the education of the public by the encouragement of the arts, particularly the arts of theatre, opera and dance, by the production of theatre, opera and dance both in the UK and internationally, particularly with the intention of attracting new audiences to those art forms and of providing training opportunities for emerging artists.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Islington

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jason Smith Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
James Quaife Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Zeynep Kepekli Trustee 03 September 2024
None on record
Dawn James Trustee 14 May 2024
None on record
Vincent Rutger Beelaerts van Blokland Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Chris Cook Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Robert Khan Trustee 04 December 2023
None on record
Helen Williamson Trustee 12 April 2023
None on record
Kathryn Mullan Trustee 12 April 2023
None on record
Aaron Ross Porter Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Matthew James Hedges Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Molly Waiting Trustee 31 May 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.05m £944.80k £582.15k £414.09k £1.76m
Total expenditure £963.64k £685.88k £657.63k £577.29k £471.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.25k £30.00k N/A £1.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £462.96k £214.06k £43.50k N/A £152.17k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £567.09k £590.14k £505.33k N/A £1.61m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £24.25k £878 £2.60k N/A £3.88k
Income - Other £0 £139.72k £30.72k N/A £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £926.92k £650.04k £634.73k N/A £469.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds £36.72k £35.85k £22.90k N/A £1.69k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £95.11k £90.87k £85.36k N/A £1.54m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Other assets £431.19k £586.41k £540.80k N/A £450.46k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Total liabilities £142.10k £46.03k £70.39k N/A £304.48k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 January 2024 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 January 2024 74 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 December 2022 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 December 2021 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KINGS HEAD THEATRE
116p UPPER STREET
LONDON
N1 1QP
Phone:
02072268561