Trustees KH THEATRE LIMITED
Charity number: 1161483

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Smith | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Quaife | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zeynep Kepekli | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn James | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Rutger Beelaerts van Blokland | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Cook | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Khan | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Williamson | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Mullan | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Ross Porter | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Hedges | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Molly Waiting | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.