Financial history THAMES DITTON FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159912
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £6.38k £5.13k £8.38k £11.25k £11.09k
Total expenditure £6.64k £5.69k £7.07k £9.82k £10.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.11k £1.11k