WIND-UP PENGUIN THEATRE COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We bring music-theatre performances and workshops to children in the UK and overseas (who in particular but not exclusively have restricted access to the arts). In 2015, we performed over 40 shows to underprivileged children in Brazil, Peru, and Germany,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Colombia
- Germany
- Greece
- India
- Jordan
- Lebanon
- Mexico
- Peru
- Romania
- Serbia
Governance
- 14 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elisabeth Ann Eva Swedlund | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Bird | Trustee | 27 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Moss | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Brown | Trustee | 25 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.41k | £3.63k | £1.68k | £9.80k | £16.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.88k | £3.10k | £1.56k | £8.38k | £13.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 November 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO EDUCATE AND RAISE THE ARTISTIC TASTES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY HAVE LIMITED ACCESS TO THE ARTS, THROUGH DESIGN AND DELIVERY OF PROFESSIONAL-STANDARD, ORIGINAL MUSIC-THEATRE PERFORMANCES AND WORKSHOPS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
334 Grand Drive
LONDON
SW20 9NQ
- Phone:
- 07858830378
- Email:
- hello@winduppenguin.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window