Financial history NESTON FLOWER SOCIETY

Charity number: 1161124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2019 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023
Total gross income £10.39k £3.69k £4.74k £9.46k £9.36k
Total expenditure £10.39k £3.69k £4.74k £7.41k £7.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A