Trustees NESTON FLOWER SOCIETY
Charity number: 1161124

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Fisher | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Forshaw | Trustee | 21 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
RUTH CATTRELL | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WARING | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
WENDY COOPER | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE STONEHOUSE | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA WOOD | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA MCDEVITT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DIANA GREENFIELD | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.