THE ISOKON GALLERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of the Isokon Gallery at The Isokon Building in Hampstead, London. Publication of information associated with the Isokon Building. Please see our annual report for a more detailed description of our activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 26 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN STEWART ALLAN MA | Chair | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas de Gay | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leyla Daybelge | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Klas Magnus Wilhelm Englund | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|||||
FIONA HEATHER LAMB | Trustee | 26 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.23k | £42.82k | £20.27k | £42.55k | £38.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.83k | £19.58k | £24.65k | £37.45k | £41.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.61k | £1.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
30 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 26 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECTS OF MODERN ARCHITECTURE AND SOCIAL HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1. THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN EXHIBITION GALLERY AT THE ISOKON BUILDING, HAMPSTEAD, LONDON (A GRADE I LISTED BUILDING DESIGNED BY WELLS COATES) TO SHOW THE PURPOSE, DESIGN, HISTORY AND RELATED ASPECTS OF THE BUILDING. 2. STAGING EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES AND SEMINARS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 25
Whitehall Lodge
Pages Lane
LONDON
N10 1NY
- Phone:
- 07713507018
- Email:
- info@isokongallery.org
- Website:
-
isokongallery.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window