KIRKLEES VISUAL IMPAIRMENT NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KVIN also known as Outlookers is a sight loss organisation which supports people living with sight loss to learn to use technology to help remain independent. We have several drop-in facilities across Kirklees. We recognise the devastation that losing sight can cause. The majority of our volunteers and staff are registered blind and have lived experience to offer .
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £22,906 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 23 February 2015: CIO registration
- Outlookers (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID QUARMBY | Chair | 13 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Gillian Elisabeth Hughes | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Owen | Trustee | 03 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Beverley | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aisha Saiyad | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Howard | Trustee | 18 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Moin Valli | Trustee | 14 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.49k | £129.08k | £217.44k | £219.64k | £268.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.19k | £110.39k | £145.11k | £210.72k | £215.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.83k | N/A | £21.10k | £22.91k | £22.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON REGISTERED ON 23 FEB 2015 as amended on 22 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED (VISUALLY IMPAIRED) PEOPLE WHO LIVE, WORK OR STUDY IN KIRKLEES AND THE SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A)PROVIDING EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND ADVICE WHICH WILL ENABLE THEM TO LIVE MORE INDEPENDENTLY; B)PROVIDING SOCIAL AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brian Jackson House
New North Parade
Huddersfield
HD1 5JP
- Phone:
- 01484519988
- Email:
- info@kvin.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window