THE ADD-VANCE ADHD AND AUTISM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPORTING AND TRAINING INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEURODIVERSE CONDITIONS SUCH AS ADHD AND/OR AUTISM. WORKING WITH FAMILIES AND PROFESSIONALS TO CHANGE PERCEPTIONS AND INCREASE UNDERSTANDING. ACTIVITIES INCLUDE TRAINING, COACHING, SUPPORT, GUIDANCE AND INFORMATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £193,835 from 5 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 October 2014: CIO registration
- 21 October 2015: Funds received from 1154137 THE ADD-VANCE ADHD AND AUTISM TRUST
- ADD-VANCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth West | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rebecca Hunt | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Joanne Marangos | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Anne Clifton Reitemeier | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.02k | £215.81k | £239.43k | £336.36k | £338.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.13k | £192.26k | £221.00k | £306.83k | £318.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £34.50k | £123.00k | £122.81k | £150.98k | £193.84k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Oct 2014 as amended on 07 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER (ADHD) AND/OR AUTISM SPECTRUM DISORDERS (ASD) AND THEIR FAMILIES. 2. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG PARENTS AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AS A RESULT OF HAVING ADHD AND/OR ASD AND HELP THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO ADHD AND/OR ASD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING TRAINING COURSES, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FOUNDATION HOUSE
2-4 FORUM PLACE
FIDDLEBRIDGE LANE
HATFIELD
HERTFORDSHIRE
AL10 0RN
- Phone:
- 01727833963
- Email:
- Herts@add-vance.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window