TANZANIA ACTION FOR DISABLED (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main goals of TAD are: a. To relieve the needs of people with disability in Tanzania, including by assisting them to obtain their full rights and privileges as citizens. b. To promote any charitable purposes for the benefit of the community in Tanzania, in particular the advancement of education and relieving the needs of orphans and street children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Tanzania
Governance
- 10 December 2014: CIO registration
- TAD (UK) (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUCAS MHENGA | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVIS MWAKITWANGE | Trustee | 03 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40 | |
|
Total expenditure | £65 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £36 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 318 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2022 | 318 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2022 | 683 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: • TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH DISABILITY IN TANZANIA, INCLUDING BY ASSISTING THEM TO OBTAIN THEIR FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS • TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN TANZANIA, IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF ORPHANS AND STREET CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 229
Dumbarton Court
Brixton Hill
London
SW2 5LS
- Phone:
- 02086711405
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window