BULWELL FOREST GARDEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have general volunteering opportunities 4 days a week, growing produce and ornamental flowers organically, and encouraging wildlife in a previously unused piece of land. We also benefit from an outdoor kitchen where we run a weekly Lunch Club during the summer, using seasonal produce straight from the ground. Adult training courses and Family Activity Days take place throughout the year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £21,205 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 21 January 2015: Standard registration
- BFG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lauren Gibbons | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Jones | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melkorka Stiller-Magnusdottir | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Julie Clark | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Hilary Burn | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.53k | £94.09k | £87.32k | £131.35k | £171.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.47k | £69.12k | £89.38k | £120.45k | £130.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.82k | £15.94k | £12.43k | £18.00k | £21.21k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/12/2014
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL WORKSHOPS IN HORTICULTURE AND HEALTHY EATING AND TRAINING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BULWELL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bulwell Forest Garden
Austin Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG6 9HE
- Phone:
- 07890557854
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window