Financial history ST EDWARD'S SCHOOL

Charity number: 1159721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.81m £4.38m £4.49m £5.56m £6.49m
Total expenditure £3.45m £3.87m £4.35m £4.91m £6.22m
Income from government contracts £3.47m £4.06m £4.18m £5.02m £6.17m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £500 £0 £4.43k £237.05k £0
Income - Other trading activities £6.00k £6.66k £5.22k £5.97k £5.73k
Income - Charitable activities £3.47m £4.06m £4.18m £5.02m £6.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £239.04k £209.61k £202.98k £188.83k £205.15k
Income - Other £89.06k £104.02k £98.32k £111.56k £109.29k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.42m £3.84m £4.32m £4.89m £6.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.61k £28.69k £30.11k £21.40k £22.80k
Expenditure - Governance £59.14k £90.06k £99.22k £109.43k £133.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £29.61k £28.69k £30.11k £21.40k £22.80k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0