IYENGAR YOGA CENTRE FOR ESSEX

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IYCE provides Iyengar Yoga classes, workshops, yoga days & courses for beginners, general & intermediate level students. Also classes for people with health problems. Initial Teacher Training is available through our mentoring system. Qualified Iyengar Yoga Teachers may also be mentored towards next level certificate. Iyengar Yoga helps improve physical, mental, emotional and spiritual health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 21 April 2015: CIO registration
- IYCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN JANE LONG | Chair | 10 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ajipeleka Giddings | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Reynolds | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vashti Tara Davis Miss | Trustee | 22 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE ELIZABETH HANRAHAN | Trustee | 17 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.00k | £1.94k | £3.55k | £6.27k | £5.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.31k | £1.28k | £3.15k | £3.96k | £5.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 21 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF CLASSICAL TEACHINGS OF THE ART, SCIENCE, CULTURE AND PHILOSOPHY OF YOGA IN ESSEX. TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE STUDY AND PRACTICE, AND RESEARCH INTO, THE THERAPEUTIC EFFECTS OF YOGA TO IMPROVE PHYSICAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL HEALTH AND ALLEVIATE SUFFERING. TO EMPLOY THE METHODS AND SYSTEMS OF TEACHING, TEACHER TRAINING AND REMEDIAL (THERAPEUTIC) YOGA DEVELOPED AND REFINED BY IYENGAR YOGA. TO OPERATE WITHIN AND PROMOTE A CULTURE OF SERVICE TO OTHERS AND THE ETHICAL VALUES OF YOGA, NAMELY NON-VIOLENCE, TRUTHFULNESS, NON-STEALING, CONTINENCE AND NON-HOARDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IYCE
154 Long Brandocks
Writtle
Chelmsford
CM1 3JR
- Phone:
- 07460 101510
- Email:
- info@iyce.com
- Website:
-
iyce.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window