Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL CHARITY ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1160298
Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 277 days
Annual return 05 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 643 days
Annual return 05 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1008 days
Annual return 05 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1373 days
Annual return 05 October 2019 01 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 October 2019 01 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window