HABEAS CORPUS PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE HABEAS CORPUS PROJECT IS A LEGAL CHARITY THAT PROMOTES ACCESS TO JUSTICE FOR IMMIGRATION DETAINEES BY CHALLENGING UNLAWFUL DETENTION. WE PROVIDE PRO BONO LEGAL REPRESENTATION TO PEOPLE WHO CANNOT AFFORD A PRIVATE LAWYER AND HAVE BEEN UNSUCCESSFUL IN GAINING A LEGAL AID CONTRACT. WE CHALLENGE DETENTION THROUGH BAIL APPLICATIONS, TEMPORARY ADMISSION REQUESTS AND APPLICATIONS IN THE HIGH COURT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- HCP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/12/2015 | 17/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.90k | £37.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.18k | £44.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 December 2016 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 December 2016 | 12 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 17 December 2015 | 16 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
17 December 2015
(These accounts |
09 March 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW AS IT APPLIES TO IMMIGRATION DETENTION IN ENGLAND AND WALES. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE CIO MAY DO ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING: (A) PROVIDE PRO-BONO ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS IN IMMIGRATION DETENTION IN THE UK FOR LEGAL ADVICE AND REPRESENTATION IN CLAIMS FOR UNLAWFUL DETENTION. (B) PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN LAW AND PROCEDURE RELATING TO UNLAWFUL DETENTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF HUMAN RIGHTS ORGANISATIONS, RESEARCHERS, ACADEMICS, LAWYERS, STUDENTS AND OTHER PARTIES INTERESTED IN UNLAWFUL DETENTION. (C) WRITE AND PUBLISH RESEARCH AND GUIDANCE IN RELATION TO UNLAWFUL DETENTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF IMMIGRATION DETAINEES, POLICY MAKERS, ACADEMICS, LAWYERS AND STUDENTS AND OTHER PARTIES INTERESTED IN UNLAWFUL DETENTION. (D) HELP PROMOTE ENFORCEMENT OF ARTICLE 5 OF THE EUROPEAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS IN THE UK IN ITS APPLICATION TO IMMIGRATION DETAINEES I.E. THE RIGHT TO LIBERTY AND SECURITY (E) HELP PROMOTE THE ENFORCEMENT OF THE PRINCIPLES CONTAINED IN THE MAGNA CARTA IN THE UK IN ITS APPLICATION IMMIGRATION DETAINEES I.E.”NO MAN SHALL BE TAKEN OR IMPRISONED SAVE FOR THE LAWFUL JUDGEMENT OF HIS PEERS OR BY THE LAW OF LAND”
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window