THE KYLE ASQUITH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160018
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Kyle Asquith Foundation is for the advancement of education for the public benefit of students attending Cockburn School.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,674
Total expenditure: £4,460

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Leeds City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 January 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID GURNEY Chair 18 February 2014
None on record
TRACY ASQUITH Trustee 18 February 2014
None on record
ANGUS SMITH Trustee 18 February 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.14k £1.09k £1.31k £1.75k £3.67k
Total expenditure £1.54k £3.06k £955 £5.00k £4.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 June 2024 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 November 2022 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Cockburn School
Gipsy Lane
LEEDS
LS11 5TT
Phone:
01132719962
Website:

No information available