RETHINKING ECONOMICS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rethinking Economics is an international network of students, academics and professionals building a better economics in society and the classroom. Through a mixture of campaigning, events and engaging projects, Rethinking Economics connects people globally to discuss and enact the change needed for the future of economics, and to propel the vital debate on what economics is today.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 October 2014: CIO registration
- RETHINKING ECONOMICS (Working name)
- PCE (Previous name)
- POST-CRASH ECONOMICS (Previous name)
- REPCE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marie Mathilde Catherine Suberbere | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ignacio Silva Neira | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samia Dumbuya | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mads Falkenfleth Jensen | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Meadway | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bandile Andile Nkululeko Ngidi | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Hannah Hunt | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mehroosh Tak | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Toke Dahler-Larsen | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £292.68k | £349.36k | £662.88k | £357.59k | £310.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £311.17k | £262.06k | £337.28k | £611.13k | £360.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £661.07k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £1.71k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £96 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £327.28k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 24 OCT 2014 REGISTERED ON 21/10/2015 as amended on 21 Jul 2022 as amended on 21 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ECONOMICS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPACES
PETER HOUSE
OXFORD STREET
MANCHESTER
M1 5AN
- Phone:
- 07512307123
- Email:
- info@rethinkeconomics.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window