OVO-EPKITETA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ovo ekpiteta foundation is a charity organisation.that operates in Nigeria to help educate people all over Nigeria .train youths in skills aqusition on various trades as part of educating them.so they can be of benefit to their family and their community .the organisation is into creating health awareness all over the world .preventing illness through awareness preventing illness around the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 03 March 2015: CIO registration
- OVO FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OGHENETEGA IDOGHO | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Afonughe Ampofo | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
BUKUOLA AYODELE | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Ayodele | Trustee | 03 March 1993 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2015 | 31/10/2016 | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.00k | £500 | £355 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.50k | £300 | £355 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 618 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 983 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 983 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1348 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1348 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 November 2021 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1713 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE ANYWHERE AROUND THE WORLD. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN NIGERIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 18
Walsham House
Walsham Road
London
SE14 5LR
- Phone:
- 07424333927
- Email:
- oovofoundation@gamil.com
- Website:
-
OVOEPKITETAFOUNDATION.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window