Accounts and annual returns FIRST UTILITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159169
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 June 2016 On Time