FIRST UTILITY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1159169
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

First Utility Foundation makes grants to small and medium sized UK-registered charities whose work helps vulnerable families and individuals across the UK.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016

Total income: £100,000
Total expenditure: £98,583

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 2014: Standard registration
  • 18 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £110.00k £100.00k
Total expenditure £102.53k £98.58k
Income from government contracts £0 £0
Income from government grants £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 06 June 2016 On Time