ASSOCIATION OF CARERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting unpaid Carers in East Sussex to continue in their caring role by providing FREE, high-quality, volunteer-led services that encourage independence and reduce isolation. Services include - Respite with befriending, Talk and Support, Computer/technical support, Respite for Healthcare appointments, Lunch club, Carers cafes, and online social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £296,148 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Barker | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hammett | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Scollay | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Witten | Trustee | 28 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Thomas | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Apps | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Thomas Piper | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Service | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE WHITEHEAD | Trustee | 22 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.77k | £428.48k | £263.12k | £269.95k | £332.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.66k | £171.67k | £190.45k | £273.98k | £312.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £185.00k | £185.00k | £210.22k | £191.15k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.29k | £22.29k | £20.70k | £39.00k | £296.15k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
(A)TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONGST PEOPLE OF EAST SUSSEX, WHO ARE CARING, OR WHO HAVE CARED FOR, A PERSON OR PERSONS IN NEED AT HOME AND THE DEPENDANTS OF CARERS AND FOR THE PURPOSE OF PROMOTING THE WELFARE OF CARERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO REQUIRE HELP AND SUPPORT WITHIN THEIR HOMES.(B)TO RELIEVE, ASSIST, ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE CARERS IN THEIR CARING ROLE AND SUPPORT THEIR DEPENDANTS "IN FURTHERANCE OF THE SAID OBJECTS".(C)TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONGST CARERS AND THE PUBLIC IN EAST SUSSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 Sedlescombe Road North
St. Leonards-on-Sea
East Sussex
TN37 7EN
- Phone:
- 01424722309
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window