Accounts and annual returns Three Counties Liberal Jewish Community Ltd.

Charity number: 1159055
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 14 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 14 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 07 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 05 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 05 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 08 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window